MD SB203 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the standard for achieving a no net loss of forest policy by altering the definition of "no net loss of forest" to mean that 40% of all land in Maryland is covered by forest as determined by data used in the most current Chesapeake Bay Watershed Model; and providing that the Act may not be interpreted to expand, limit, or otherwise disrupt any program conducted in accordance with the Chesapeake Bay Total Maximum Daily Load, a municipal separate storm sewer system permit, urban tree canopy goals, or any other local program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - No Net Loss of Forest - Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (34-13)
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment {814831/1 Adopted
2019-03-06SenateLaid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {814831/1
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-23SenateHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback