MD SB20 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the court to admit into evidence in certain criminal proceedings certain out of court statements made by a child victim or witness who is under the age of 13 years and an alleged victim or a witness in a case concerning a crime of violence, subject to certain requirements.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2022-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {563523/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {813422/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB284 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Evidence
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Notices
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Violence
Witnesses
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Evidence
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Notices
Sexual Offenses
Victims
Violence
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |