MD SB199 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the driver of a vehicle to drive on the left side of the roadway in a no-passing zone to overtake and pass at a safe distance a bicycle traveling in the same direction in accordance with a certain provision of law and in a certain manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Favorable Adopted (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-27HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-02-26SenateThird Reading Passed (38-8)
2020-02-24SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-02-21SenateMotion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-02-21SenateFavorable Adopted (34-12)
2020-02-20SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-17SenateHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB230 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21305(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21307(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback