MD SB197 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a municipality, by ordinance, to establish a Vacant and Blighted Buildings Registry and to require an owner of a vacant building to register it within 30 days after the building becomes vacant under specified circumstances; requiring a municipality to consider specified factors in determining whether a building is a vacant building or a blighted vacant building; authorizing the governing body of a municipality to set special tax rates for vacant buildings and blighted vacant buildings; etc.
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Appeals
Building Codes
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Health
Inspections
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Property Tax
Real Property
Registration
Safety
Taxes - Property
Appeals
Building Codes
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Health
Inspections
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Nuisances
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Property Tax
Real Property
Registration
Safety
Taxes - Property