MD SB197 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the statewide information technology master plan developed by the Secretary of Information Technology include a cybersecurity framework; and requiring that the Secretary consider materials developed by the National Institute of Standards and Technology in developing or modifying the cybersecurity framework.
Title
Statewide Information Technology Master Plan - Inclusion of Cybersecurity Framework - Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
Safety
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Safety
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology