MD SB196 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition against a tenant who is seeking to redeem or extinguish ground rent providing certain documentation and payments to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation earlier than 90 days after an application for redemption or extinguishment has been posted on the Department's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Ground Leases - Redemption and Extinguishment - Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182
2023-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2023-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2023-03-30HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-03-30HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2023-03-02HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2023-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2023-02-24SenateSecond Reading Passed
2023-02-24SenateFavorable Adopted
2023-02-22SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2023-01-24SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-20SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB93 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property8801(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property8804(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback