MD SB194 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland State Department of Education to conduct a study and provide recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2014, regarding improvements to the Maryland Public Charter School Program; requiring the Maryland State Department of Education to submit a report on the status of a specified study to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to review a methodology, data analysis, and recommendations; etc.
Title
Education - Charter Schools - Study to Recommend Improvements to the Maryland Public Charter School Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Kaiser) Adopted (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (132-2) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {135063/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {334038/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Education
Education, State Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Education, State Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset