MD SB193 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Facilities - Transfer of Ownership and Abolishment of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Facilities - Transfer of Ownership and Abolishment of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0193?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0193f.pdf |