MD SB192 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB762
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (121-9)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (121-9)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements, procedures, and prohibitions relating to the use of facial recognition technology by a law enforcement agency under certain circumstances; requiring The Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to develop and administer a training program regarding the use of facial recognition technology in the course of criminal investigations by June 30, 2025; requiring a law enforcement agency using or contracting to use facial recognition technology to prepare and publish a certain annual report by February 1; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-9) |
2023-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {763520/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {593723/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB762 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
HB223 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
HB223 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Subjects
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Civil Actions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Digital Images
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Evidence
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Identification
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Photography
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Threats
Trials
Violence
Warrants
Auditors and Audits
Civil Actions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Digital Images
Disclosure
Discrimination
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Evidence
Hearings
Human Trafficking
Identification
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Photography
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Threats
Trials
Violence
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |