MD SB186 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain retirees of the State Retirement and Pension System to rescind a request to change a designated beneficiary by sending certain notice to the State Retirement Agency before a certain allowance payment normally becomes due; and allowing a retiree who rescinds a certain change of designated beneficiary in a timely manner to receive the allowance payable prior to the change of designated beneficiary, without a certain retroactive adjustment.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Death
Notices
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Death
Notices
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement