MD SB186 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of One Billion, Ninety-One Million, One Hundred and Seventy-Nine Thousand Dollars ($1,091,179,000), the proceeds to be used for certain necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring certain real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to certain subdivisions and other organizations for certain development and improvement purposes; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-8) (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Jones) Adopted (127-3) (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-4) (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-8) (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Jones) Adopted (127-3) (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-4) (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-8) |
2018-03-28 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | (Delegates Haynes, McKay and Reznik) |
2018-03-26 | House | House advisors: |
2018-03-26 | House | Delegates Jones, McIntosh, Gaines, A. Miller, and Ghrist |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-03-26 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2018-03-26 | Senate | (Senators Madaleno, Eckardt and King) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate advisors: |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, McFadden, and Edwards |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-4) |
2018-03-26 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Jones) Adopted (127-3) |
2018-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment (#44-50) Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment (#10-43) Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment (#5-9) Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment (#2-4) Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-23 | House | Special Order until 3/26 (Delegate Jones) Adopted |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#86-94) Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#46-85) Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#45) Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#17-44) Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#11-16) Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#2-10) Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |