MD SB18 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the State individual income tax rate to be 3.9% for individuals or spouses filing joint returns with federal adjusted gross income in excess of $30,000; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Flat Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-11SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-11-16SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback