MD SB179 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property used for the purposes of a public school robotics program or nonprofit robotics program in the State; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Title
Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {869635/1 Report Adopted |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Counties
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Youth
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Property Tax
Public Schools
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Youth