MD SB179 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to repeal provisions relating to election of circuit court judges; requiring the Governor, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, to appoint a qualified person to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of the circuit court; altering the term of office of circuit court judges from 15 to 10 years; requiring the Governor to reappoint a circuit court judge, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, upon the expiration of the judge's term; etc.
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Hearings
Judges
Public Information
Referendum
Committees and Commissions
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Hearings
Judges
Public Information
Referendum