MD SB175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-06 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-06 - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to facilitate strategic planning, manage a Maryland Technology Infrastructure Fund, and coordinate economic development service delivery; requiring the Corporation, under certain circumstances, to award capital and operating financial assistance from the Fund to support certain purposes; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Authority in the Corporation; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Infrastructure Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2019-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867779/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Corporations
Cybersecurity
Economic and Community Development
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Investments
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Corporations
Cybersecurity
Economic and Community Development
Ethics
General Assembly
Governor
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Investments
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers