MD SB172 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the criteria for determining the use of funds in the Bay Restoration Fund for certain purposes in certain fiscal years to include climate resiliency and flood control; and specifying that certain grants to certain local governments may be used for stormwater management measures that include stormwater measures relating to climate resiliency or flood control.
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {344033/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB78 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay Restoration
Environment
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Weather
Weights and Measures
Environment
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Weather
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |