MD SB172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 1:00 pm in Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Public Charter School Facility Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the Fund shall be used to provide funding to public charter schools in the State to acquire, plan, develop, finance, construct, improve, repair, and maintain public charter school facilities; requiring the State Department of Education to administer the Fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate a certain amount to the Fund each year; requiring the Department to establish certain procedures for schools to request funds; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Charter School Facility Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2019-01-31SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
2019-01-31SenateHearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback