MD SB169 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order for certain violations; increasing certain penalties for certain acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry or dental hygiene; altering from a misdemeanor to a felony penalties for violating certain provisions of law related to dental laboratory work or advertising a dental appliance by increasing the fine to up to $2,000 per day, instead of a one-time fine, or imprisonment of up to 2 years, rather than 6 months; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-1) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {714837/1 Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB947 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Subjects
Advertising
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Equipment
Ethics
Fines
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Malpractice
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Equipment
Ethics
Fines
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Medical Malpractice
Medical Treatments
Penalties and Sentences
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |