MD SB169 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health to convene a workgroup to study the advisability of the State forming a generic drugs and medical supplies purchasing cooperative and establishing Maryland as an open formulary State; requiring the workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2019; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug and Medical Supply Access and Affordability Workgroup
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Equipment
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Drugs
Equipment
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Reports
Sunset