MD SB168 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council as an independent unit of State government with the authority to conduct and support advocacy, systems change, and capacity-building efforts to promote inclusive communities and equity in services for individuals with disabilities in the State, research best practices and provide related training and technical assistance to communities in the State, and inform State and local leaders about disability issues.
Title
Maryland Developmental Disabilities Council - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB504 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Developmental Disabilities
Disabled
Federal Government
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Developmental Disabilities
Disabled
Federal Government
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor, and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 7-12A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7-12A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7-12A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7-12A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |