MD SB168 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "qualifying biomass" for purposes of excluding energy derived from certain material from being eligible for meeting certain Tier 1 obligations under the renewable energy portfolio standard; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning January 1, 2021, or later.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance
2020-01-15SenateHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB98 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7701(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7704(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback