MD SB167 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB377

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the calculation for certain funding for the Maryland State Arts Council for fiscal year 2025 and each fiscal year thereafter; repealing a certain requirement for certain funds distributed to the Maryland State Arts Council to be included in the Council's prior fiscal year appropriation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland State Arts Council - Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548
2023-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2023-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (128-6)
2023-04-08HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2023-03-26HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-26HouseHearing canceled
2023-03-22HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-27HouseReferred Appropriations
2023-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2023-02-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2023-02-22SenateFloor Amendment {513721/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
2023-02-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {983720/1 Adopted
2023-02-15SenateMotion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
2023-02-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {983720/1 (Budget and Taxation Committee)
2023-02-14SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2023-02-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {983720/1
2023-02-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2023-01-20SenateHearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
2023-01-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

SB377 (Carry Over) 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2016(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2017(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement7325(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2202(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback