MD SB164 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Decreasing from 25 to 12 the number of new employees that a business must employ in order to qualify for a property tax credit against the Queen Anne's County property tax imposed on businesses that make specified real property improvements.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Property Tax Credit - Commercial Investment and Economic Development
Sponsors
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2013-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Property Tax
Queen Anne's County
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Property Tax
Queen Anne's County
Real Property
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment