MD SB164 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a plastic carryout bag manufacturer from providing, selling, or offering for sale plastic carryout bags for use or distribution in the State unless specified language is printed or displayed on the bags and the manufacturer has registered with the Department of the Environment in a specified manner; requiring a plastic carryout bag manufacturer to register every 2 years by submitting to the Department a specified registration form, fee, and plan; terminating the Act after September 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Maryland Plastic Bag Recycling Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-09 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments 654734/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Counties
Education
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fees
Forms
Labeling
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Recycling
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Commerce and Business
Counties
Education
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Fees
Forms
Labeling
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Recycling
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset