MD SB160 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit program in the Department of Commerce to be the Innovation Investment Incentive Tax Credit program; providing that the purpose of the program is to foster the growth of Maryland's technology sectors; expanding the tax credit to include investments in certain technology companies; prohibiting the Department from certifying eligibility for tax credits for investments in a single technology sector in excess of 25% of a certain amount in any fiscal year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Program - Expansion, Extension, and Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-04-08SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (99-36)
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {305063/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-01HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-18HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-02-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-10SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-02-10SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-11SenateHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2020-10-22SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2013(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2018(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development5109(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General1303(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10733(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback