MD SB16 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget; specifying that the purpose of the Workgroup is to study, evaluate, and make recommendations concerning budgeting models used by state or local governments in the United States that utilize well-defined service categories to set budget funding priorities and allocate resources; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; terminating the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-14SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-07SenateHearing 1/17 at 10:30 a.m.
2019-01-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-03SenateHearing 1/17 at 1:45 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-11-16SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback