MD SB158 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-11 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-11 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring every employer in the State to allow any employee, rather than any employee who claims to be a registered voter, in the State up to 2 hours absence from work to vote in an election, rather than only on election day; altering the requirement that certain employees furnish to their employers certain proof to specify that the proof be reasonable and furnished in a timely manner; and prohibiting an employer from discriminating, retaliating, or taking any form of reprisal against an employee who is absent from work to vote.
Title
Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB398 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Referred Finance Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Discrimination
Elections
Evidence
Forms
Harassment
Registration
State Employees
Time
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Elections
Evidence
Forms
Harassment
Registration
State Employees
Time
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0158?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0158f.pdf |