MD SB158 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Community Dental Clinics Grant Program; authorizing the Board of Public Works, on the recommendation of the Secretary of Health, to make grants under the Program to counties, municipal corporations, and nonprofit organizations for the purpose of supporting the provision of dental services by community dental clinics; requiring the Governor to include funding in the State operating budget bill or capital budget bill for the Program beginning in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {237979/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m. (Finance) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Budgets
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Clinics
Community Development
Construction
Counties
Courts
Dentists
Equipment
Fees
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Land Records
Leases and Rent
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Places of Worship
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Recordings
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning
Budgets
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Clinics
Community Development
Construction
Counties
Courts
Dentists
Equipment
Fees
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Land Records
Leases and Rent
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Places of Worship
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Recordings
Religion
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Treasurers
Zoning and Planning