MD SB157 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB368
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the manner in which the chief executive officer of a municipality may fulfill certain notice requirements concerning proposed municipal charter amendments; requiring the chief executive officer of a municipality to post an exact copy of the proposed amendment in a certain public place for at least 40 days immediately preceding the referendum at which the question is to be submitted; and requiring the municipality to maintain certain records or receipts and make the records or receipts available to the public.
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {453324/1 Adopted |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {283327/1 Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB104 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
SB368 (Carry Over) 2022-02-01 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
SB368 (Carry Over) 2022-02-01 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Charters
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
News Media
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Publications
Records
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
News Media
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Publications
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 4 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 4 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |