MD SB157 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the health care providers who provide consultation, diagnosis, and treatment of a mental or emotional disorder to which minors who are 16 years old and older have the same capacity as an adult to consent; providing that the capacity to consent does not include the capacity to refuse consultation, diagnosis, or treatment for a mental or emotional disorder by health care providers for which a specified individual has given consent; etc.
Title
Consultation, Diagnosis, and Treatment of Mental and Emotional Disorders - Consent by Minors
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-15) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-15) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (124-15) |
2015-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {156983/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {677472/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Counselors
Disclosure
Health Occupations
Mental Health
Minors
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Health
Social Workers
Disclosure
Health Occupations
Mental Health
Minors
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Health
Social Workers