MD SB154 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the civil penalty to require up to $500 for a violation recorded by a school bus monitoring camera for failure to stop for a school vehicle operating alternately flashing red lights; and requiring the Montgomery County Department of Police to submit a specified report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018, relating to the use of school bus monitoring cameras in Montgomery County.
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-8) (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-12) (Y: 123 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-12) (Y: 123 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-8) |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-04-08 | House | Delegates Beidle, Folden, and Wivell |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senators Brochin, Norman, and Smith |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-12) |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {480115/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {863125/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {778678/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
District Courts
Fines
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
School Buses
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
District Courts
Fines
Law Enforcement
Montgomery County
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
School Buses
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video