MD SB149 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 1:00 pm House Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study issues related to the classification of and penalties for criminal and civil violations in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations regarding the current statutory scheme for criminal and civil violations throughout the Maryland Code to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-14SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-02-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {628971/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-23SenateHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback