MD SB146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB10
Note: Carry Over of previous SB590
Note: Carry Over of previous SB590
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-25 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "Tier 1 renewable source" for purposes of excluding energy derived from waste and refuse from being eligible for inclusion in the renewable energy portfolio standard; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years starting on or after January 1, 2024.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources - Alterations (Reclaim Renewable Energy Act of 2024)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB146 (Carry Over) 2024-01-25 - Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
HB166 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
SB590 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
HB166 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
SB590 (Carry Over) 2023-02-08 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0146?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0146f.pdf |