MD SB143 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB260
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2023, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances beginning on a certain date; etc.
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB143 (Carry Over) 2022-01-27 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
HB18 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB18 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-14 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Architects
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
internet
Liability
Notices
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Contractors
Contracts
Data
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
internet
Liability
Notices
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1733 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0143?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0143f.pdf |