MD SB142 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-11 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain standards and requirements governing the provision of services and the granting of privileges by the Maryland Aviation Administration with respect to commercial activity undertaken by rental vehicle companies and peer-to-peer car sharing programs at State airports; establishing that the Administration's authority over commercial activity at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport extends to a commercial zone that is within a 7-mile radius of the main terminal; etc.
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB393 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Airports
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Advertising
Airports
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 19 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 18 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 5 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0142?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0142f.pdf |