MD SB14 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law to require, rather than authorize, the Board of Public Works to pay certain compensation in a certain manner to a certain individual who has been erroneously convicted, sentenced, and subsequently confined for a felony on receipt of a certain order; authorizing an administrative law judge to issue a certain order of eligibility; authorizing a certain individual who has previously received compensation to request an order for supplemental compensation in certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228478/1 Adopted |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB742 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Communications
Court Orders
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Education
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Fees
Health
Hearings
Housing
Identification
Job Training
Judges
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Documents
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State's Attorneys
Time
Tuition
Agents and Brokers
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Communications
Court Orders
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Education
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Fees
Health
Hearings
Housing
Identification
Job Training
Judges
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners
Public Works, Board of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Documents
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State's Attorneys
Time
Tuition
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 10 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |