MD SB139 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB346
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum number of years of eligibility service that certain members of the State Police Retirement System or Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may have to participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program (DROP) from 30 to 32; increasing the number of years that certain members of the State Police Retirement System or Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may participate in the DROP from 5 to 7; and authorizing certain individuals to elect to extend their participation in the DROP.
Title
State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-04-06 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {493220/1 Adopted |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB346 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB298 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
HB298 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 24 | 401.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 26 | 401.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |