MD SB139 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the University of Maryland, University College, the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science, and an off-campus nonresidential location of an institution of higher education from the requirement to establish a policy that addresses heroin and opioid addiction and prevention that includes storing naloxone and training campus police or other designated personnel on how to recognize the symptoms of an opioid overdose; requiring these institutions to provide all students with certain resources; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884535/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Education
Exemptions
Higher Education
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Public Health
State Universities and Colleges
Storage
Substance Abuse
Drugs
Education
Exemptions
Higher Education
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Public Health
State Universities and Colleges
Storage
Substance Abuse