MD SB137 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB423
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, beginning in fiscal year 2023, the Maryland Transit Administration from purchasing buses for the Administration's State transit bus fleet that are not zero-emission buses, subject to a certain exception; authorizing the Administration to purchase alternative-fuel buses under certain circumstances; requiring the Administration, on or before January 1, 2022, and each January 1 thereafter, to submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the implementation of the Act; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-33) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-04-10 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2021-04-09 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {554236/1 Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB334 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
SB423 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
SB423 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Buses
Communications
Construction
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Buses
Communications
Construction
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Fuel
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Employees
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 7 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |