MD SB137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying voting procedures in certain cumulative voting elections; clarifying the term of a certain director of a corporation elected to fill a vacancy; altering the authority of certain holders of stock to take or consent to certain action; altering the circumstances in which certain holders of stock may take certain action or consent to a certain action by delivering a consent in writing or by electronic transmission; clarifying the time by which a parent corporation is required to provide a certain notice in a certain merger; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-02-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-22SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback