MD SB137 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an official publisher that publishes legal material in an electronic record to designate the electronic record as official, under specified circumstances, and authenticate the electronic record in a specified manner; providing that specified legal material in an electronic record is presumed to be an accurate copy; requiring an official publisher of specified legal material in an electronic record to provide for the preservation and security of the record, and to ensure that it is reasonably available to the public; etc.
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Archives
Cybersecurity
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Evidence
Federal Government
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Notices
Public Information
Publications
Recordation
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Uniform Laws
Cybersecurity
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Evidence
Federal Government
Identification
Interstate Affairs
Jurisdiction
Notices
Public Information
Publications
Recordation
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Uniform Laws