MD SB135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a local government to require that certain persons who provide battery-charged fence security systems comply with certain laws, require certain persons who operate or install certain security systems to obtain certain registrations or permits, require a certain installer to submit a certain affidavit, and conduct a certain inspection; authorizing a local government to issue a citation for noncompliance and impose a fine of $500 if a system is not made compliant; etc.
Title
Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 408 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-9) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {423292/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Citations
Commercial Property
Equipment
Fines
Inspections
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Weights and Measures
Citations
Commercial Property
Equipment
Fines
Inspections
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 19 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |