MD SB132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB61
Note: Carry Over of previous SB277
Note: Carry Over of previous SB277
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by a public safety officer; repealing a certain limitation on the amount of the credit; requiring the governing body of a county or municipal corporation that authorizes the credit to establish, by law, the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of eligibility for the credit; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB132 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB277 (Carry Over) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
SB277 (Carry Over) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Correctional Officers
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Sheriffs
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Volunteers
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Sheriffs
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |