MD SB132 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a custodian of a public record is required to disclose the home address or home telephone number of a notary public only if the custodian has not been provided with the business address or business telephone number of the notary public.
Title
Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-21) |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-12) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m. |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Disclosure
Examinations
Inspections
Notaries Public
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Examinations
Inspections
Notaries Public
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 332 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |