MD SB132 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Cecil County Breeders' Fair, Inc., or its successor allocate the profits earned from horse racing at the Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area to the Union Hospital of Cecil County; etc.
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |