MD SB128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring county boards of education to annually set the start and end dates of the school year for schools in the county; removing a provision relating to extending the school year beyond June 15; requiring that a certain statement be mailed to voters if the Act is submitted to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election to be held in November 2020 for their approval or rejection; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Control of School Calendars Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Overridden (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Senate Concurs House Amendments (31-15) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-15) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-45) (Y: 96 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {663528/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-28) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {613828/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (14-32) (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {563222/2 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {373428/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-32) (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {373428/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13
2019-03-29HouseVeto overridden (93-43)
2019-03-28SenateVeto overridden (32-15)
2019-03-27SenateVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (31-15)
2019-03-18SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments (31-15)
2019-03-15SenateSpecial Order until 3/18 (Senator West) Adopted
2019-03-14SenateSpecial Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (95-45)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {835666/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {835666/2
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-02-12SenateThird Reading Passed (31-13)
2019-02-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-08SenateFloor Amendment {663528/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-28)
2019-02-07SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hershey)
2019-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {663528/1 (Senator Hershey)
2019-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {373428/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)
2019-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {373428/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-32)
2019-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {563222/2 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-31)
2019-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {613828/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (14-32)
2019-02-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted (32-14)
2019-02-07SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-02-07SenateFavorable
2019-02-06SenateSpecial Order until 2/7 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2019-02-06SenateFavorable
2019-02-06SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-18SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0128&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0128f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0128t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0128e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_13_sb0128e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0128_56322202.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0128_61382801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0128_37342801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0128_37342802.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0128_66352801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0128_83566602.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0128.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0128_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0157.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0158.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0159.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0160.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0161.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0168.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0186.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0128_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0422.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0602.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0603.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/sb0128.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0833.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback