MD SB127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an institution of higher education from using certain third-party admissions application information about the criminal background of the applicant to deny admission; altering a certain process in using certain information about an applicant's criminal history to make a determination regarding the applicant's access to campus residency; and authorizing an institution of higher education to develop a process for determining or restricting access to campus residency for certain students convicted of certain crimes.
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 35 NV: 14 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-35) |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-13) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Hough) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 Adopted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discrimination
Higher Education
Housing
Notices
Public Safety
Residency
Sexual Offenses
Students
Violence
Criminal Background Investigations
Discrimination
Higher Education
Housing
Notices
Public Safety
Residency
Sexual Offenses
Students
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 26 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 26 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |