MD SB127 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from 10 grams to 1 ounce, the amount of marijuana below which possession is a civil offense, rather than a criminal offense; prohibiting a driver of a motor vehicle from smoking or consuming marijuana in the passenger area of a motor vehicle on a highway; and prohibiting an occupant of a motor vehicle from smoking marijuana in the passenger area of the motor vehicle on a highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law and Vehicle Laws – Marijuana – Criminal Threshold and Smoking in Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (36-11)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {738472/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-01-25SenateHearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22SenateHearing canceled
2018-01-24SenateHearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback