MD SB127 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from sponsoring or holding a marine gathering without obtaining a permit from the Department of Natural Resources; defining "marine gathering"; prohibiting the Department from requiring a specified permit application to be submitted within a specified time period; requiring the Department to adopt specified regulations governing marine gathering permits; requiring the Department to issue a permit under specified circumstances; authorizing the Department to require specified terms; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Marine Gathering Permit - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 41 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {153623/1 Rejected (Y: 43 N: 84 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {813822/1 Rejected (Y: 42 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {253524/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (McConkey) {153623/1 Rejected (Y: 43 N: 84 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {813822/1 Rejected (Y: 42 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {253524/1 Rejected (Y: 46 N: 90 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (83-41) | |
2012-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) 153623/1 Rejected (43-84) | |
2012-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) 813822/1 Rejected (42-93) | |
2012-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) 253524/1 Rejected (46-90) | |
2012-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Special Order until next session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (39-4) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 304830/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 304830/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-19 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-01-18 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fines
Law Enforcement
Liability
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Safety