MD SB1263 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain prohibition on making certain threats to commit or cause to be committed a crime of violence; requiring the State Department of Education to develop a certain model policy for the establishment of a threat assessment team by January 1, 2019; authorizing a certain petitioner, under certain circumstances, to file a petition for a certain restraining order alleging that, due to a mental disorder, a certain respondent is a danger to self or the person or property of another; etc.
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Waugh) Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appropriations
Assessments
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counselors
Counties
Court of Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Fraud
Governor
Grants
Guns
Health
Hearings
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Primary and Secondary Education
Protection Orders
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Safety
School Administration
Social Workers
State Employees
State's Attorneys
Students
Threats
Time
Violence
Assessments
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counselors
Counties
Court of Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Fraud
Governor
Grants
Guns
Health
Hearings
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Primary and Secondary Education
Protection Orders
Psychiatrists
Psychologists
Public Safety
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Safety
School Administration
Social Workers
State Employees
State's Attorneys
Students
Threats
Time
Violence